PA HB2463 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-27 - Act No. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for access to public records during disaster declaration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for access to public records during disaster declaration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2463 PN 3713, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2463 PN 3713, A6688, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-6688 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05455 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 2463 PN 3713, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 2463 PN 3662, 2019 A5379, GROVE (Y: 162 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House State Government: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-27SenateAct No. 77
2020-07-27SenateBecame Law without Governor's signature
2020-07-16SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-07-15SenateSigned in Senate
2020-07-15SenateSigned in House
2020-07-15SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-07-14SenateSecond consideration
2020-07-13SenateFirst consideration
2020-07-13SenateReported as committed
2020-05-25SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2020-05-05SenateIn the Senate
2020-05-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2020-05-05HouseRe-reported as amended
2020-05-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-05-04HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-04-30HouseRemoved from table
2020-04-29HouseLaid on the table
2020-04-29HouseFirst consideration
2020-04-29HouseReported as committed
2020-04-29HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2463
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2463&pn=3662
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2463&pn=3699
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2463&pn=3713
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=04/29/2020&RollCallId=1864
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=04/29/2020&RollCallId=1865
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1243
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1255
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/05/2020&RollCallId=1939
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/05/2020&RollCallId=1938
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=07/13/2020&RollCallId=1058
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=609
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=610

Bill Comments

feedback