PA HB2459 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, in uniform construction code, further providing for adoption by regulations.
Title
In uniform construction code, further providing for adoption by regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A07669 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A07669 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-09-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-18 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-18 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-18 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-06-05 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |