PA HB2454 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-04 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on April 15 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-04 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the Professional Licensure Augmentation Account and from restricted revenue accounts within the General Fund to the Department of State for use by the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs in support of the professional licensure boards assigned thereto.
Title
An Act making appropriations from the Professional Licensure Augmentation Account and from restricted revenue accounts within the General Fund to the Department of State for use by the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs in support of the professional licensure boards assigned thereto.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-06-04 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-06-04 | Second consideration | |
2008-06-03 | Removed from table | |
2008-06-02 | Laid on the table | |
2008-06-02 | First consideration | |
2008-06-02 | Reported as committed | |
2008-04-15 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2454 |