PA HB2453 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 122
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 122
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 18, 1998 (P.L.146, No.22), known as the Check Casher Licensing Act, amending the title of the act; in general provisions, further providing for authority of the Department of Banking and Securities; in licensing provisions, further providing for license terms and fees; in enforcement, further providing for suspension and revocation of license and civil penalties, for change of status, for restrictions on business of licensee and for civil penalty; and, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for applicability and repealing provisions relating to report to General Assembly.
Title
Amending the title of the act; in general provisions, further providing for authority of the Department of Banking and Securities; in licensing provisions, further providing for license terms and fees; in enforcement, further providing for suspension and revocation of license and civil penalties, for change of status, for restrictions on business of licensee and for civil penalty; and, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for applicability and repealing provisions relating to report to General Assembly.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Ellis [R] | Rep. Curtis Thomas [D] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Rep. Christopher Harris [R] | Rep. Rosita Youngblood [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2453 PN 3590, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2453 PN 3590, FP (Y: 196 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2453 PN 3590, FP (Y: 196 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | Senate | Act No. 122 |
2018-10-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-1) |
2018-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-19 | House | Second consideration |
2018-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-06 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-06 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-06-04 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |