PA HB2452 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, providing for small business grant program, imposing duties on the Department of Community and Economic Development and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for small business grant program, imposing duties on the Department of Community and Economic Development and making an appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-19 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A05783 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-26HouseRemoved from table
2020-10-26HouseLaid on the table
2020-08-28HouseRemoved from table
2020-08-28HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-20HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-19HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-19HouseFirst consideration
2020-05-19HouseReported as amended
2020-04-27HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback