PA HB2441 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 29, 1953 (P.L.304, No.66), known as the Vital Statistics Law of 1953, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in records, further providing for disclosure to governmental agencies.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in records, further providing for disclosure to governmental agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Klunk [R] | Rep. Torren Ecker [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] |
Rep. Jim Cox [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] |
Rep. Steven Mentzer [R] | Rep. Stanley Saylor [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2441 PN 2857, FP (Y: 113 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2441 PN 2857, FP (Y: 113 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-05-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (113-90) |
2022-05-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-05-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-05-23 | House | Second consideration |
2022-04-27 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-26 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred to HEALTH |