PA HB2434 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-4)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in suitability of annuity transactions, further providing for definitions, for applicability and scope of article and for duties of insurers and insurance producers, providing for insurance producer training, further providing for mitigation of responsibility and for recordkeeping and providing for regulations.
Title
In suitability of annuity transactions, further providing for definitions, for applicability and scope of article and for duties of insurers and insurance producers, providing for insurance producer training, further providing for mitigation of responsibility and for recordkeeping and providing for regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-09-25 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-04 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |