PA HB2433 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-12)
Status: Engrossed on October 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-12 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating the future bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 88 over Peters Creek, Finleyville Borough, Washington County, as the John Emerick Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the future bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 88 over Peters Creek, Finleyville Borough, Washington County, as the John Emerick Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-10 - House - House Floor: HB 2433 PN 3565, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-12SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2018-10-10SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-10HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2018-10-10HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-10-09HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-09HouseSecond consideration
2018-10-02HouseRemoved from table
2018-09-24HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-24HouseFirst consideration
2018-09-24HouseReported as committed
2018-05-23HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback