PA HB2426 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-13)
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 563 in Bucks County as the PFC John Rivers Way.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 563 in Bucks County as the PFC John Rivers Way.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2426 PN 3559, FP (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-02SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2018-10-01SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-01HouseThird consideration and final passage (184-0)
2018-10-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-09-25HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-09-25HouseSecond consideration
2018-09-24HouseRemoved from table
2018-09-12HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-25HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-25HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-25HouseReported as committed
2018-05-23HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback