PA HB2420 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 286, known as Washington Street, over the Kiskiminetas River, between Saltsburg Borough, Indiana County, and Loyalhanna Township, Westmoreland County, as the First Sergeant Alexander Kelly Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 286, known as Washington Street, over the Kiskiminetas River, between Saltsburg Borough, Indiana County, and Loyalhanna Township, Westmoreland County, as the First Sergeant Alexander Kelly Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2420 PN 3516, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2420 PN 3516, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2018-06-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2018-06-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-06 | House | Second consideration |
2018-06-05 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-04 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |