PA HB2412 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-4)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 38 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-4)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 38 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in the Governor as Commander-in-Chief, providing for use of Pennsylvania National Guard for special State duty; and making a related repeal.
Title
In the Governor as Commander-in-Chief, providing for use of Pennsylvania National Guard for special State duty; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2412 PN 2973, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2412 PN 2973, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A03904 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Floor: HB 2412 PN 2973, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A03904 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Senate | Act No. 38 of 2022 |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2022-04-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-04-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-26 | House | Second consideration |
2022-04-25 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-12 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |