PA HB2407 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-18 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-18 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 26, 1978 (P.L.1375, No.325), known as the Dam Safety and Encroachments Act, further providing for permit issuance and conditions and for enforcement orders.
Title
Further providing for permit issuance and conditions and for enforcement orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2407 PN 3205, FP (Y: 124 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2407 PN 2994, 2021 A4464 (Y: 197 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2407 PN 3205, FP (Y: 124 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2407 PN 2994, 2021 A4464 (Y: 197 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2022-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (124-76) |
2022-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-08 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-04-14 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |