PA HB240 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in realty transfer tax, further providing for excluded transactions.
Title
In realty transfer tax, further providing for excluded transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-09 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-07 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-09 | House | First consideration |
2021-11-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-25 | House | Referred to FINANCE |