PA HB2399 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 64 (Public Authorities and Quasi-Public Corporations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for powers of the Commonwealth Financing Authority.
Title
Further providing for powers of the Commonwealth Financing Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - House - HB 2399 PN 3495, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 102 N: 92 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT | |
2010-05-25 | In the Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-04-26 | Second consideration | |
2010-04-26 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-04-20 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-04-20 | Removed from table | |
2010-04-19 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-19 | First consideration | |
2010-04-19 | Reported as committed | |
2010-04-07 | Referred to COMMERCE |