PA HB2373 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-17 - Act No. 166 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-17 - Act No. 166 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of the Department of General Services and its departmental administrative and advisory boards and commissions, further providing for transfer authority over Lieutenant Governor's Mansion.
Title
In powers and duties of the Department of General Services and its departmental administrative and advisory boards and commissions, further providing for transfer authority over Lieutenant Governor's Mansion.
Sponsors
Rep. Russ Diamond [R] | Rep. Thom Welby [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-11-15 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2373 PN 3612, CONCURRENCE (Y: 196 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2373 PN 3612, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2373 PN 2895, 2021 A5863, WARD, K. Amendment No. A-5863 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 2373 PN 2895, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A03739 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2373 PN 3612, CONCURRENCE (Y: 196 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2373 PN 3612, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2373 PN 2895, 2021 A5863, WARD, K. Amendment No. A-5863 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 2373 PN 2895, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A03739 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-17 | House | Act No. 166 of 2022 |
2022-11-17 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-11-16 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-11-15 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-11-15 | House | Signed in House |
2022-11-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (196-1) |
2022-11-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-11-14 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-10-26 | House | In the House |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (50-0) |
2022-10-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-10-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2022-04-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2022-04-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-11 | House | Second consideration |
2022-03-30 | House | Removed from table |
2022-03-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-03-29 | House | First consideration |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-03-29 | House | Re-referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |