PA HB2368 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.789, No.285), known as The Insurance Department Act of 1921, further providing for definitions; providing for medical professional liability insurance; and making a related repeal.
Title
Further providing for definitions; providing for medical professional liability insurance; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-15 - House - HB 2368 PN 3450, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-12 | Laid on the table | |
2010-09-28 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-28 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-09-27 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-27 | First consideration | |
2010-09-27 | Reported as committed | |
2010-06-16 | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE | |
2010-06-15 | In the Senate | |
2010-06-15 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-14 | Second consideration | |
2010-06-14 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-04-26 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-04-26 | Removed from table | |
2010-04-21 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-21 | First consideration | |
2010-04-21 | Reported as committed | |
2010-03-24 | Referred to INSURANCE |