PA HB236 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in judgments and other liens, further providing for personal earnings exempt from process; and, in sentencing, further providing for payment of court costs, restitution and fines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In judgments and other liens, further providing for personal earnings exempt from process; and, in sentencing, further providing for payment of court costs, restitution and fines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 236 PN 202, FP (Y: 179 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-25SenateLaid on the table
2018-06-20SenateRemoved from table
2018-06-20SenateLaid on the table
2018-05-23SenateRemoved from table
2017-09-20SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-07-08SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-07-08SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-07-08SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-30SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-30SenateReported as committed
2017-03-24SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-03-20SenateIn the Senate
2017-03-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (179-18)
2017-03-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-03-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-03-13HouseSecond consideration
2017-02-08HouseRemoved from table
2017-02-07HouseLaid on the table
2017-02-07HouseFirst consideration
2017-02-07HouseReported as committed
2017-01-31HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=236
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0236&pn=0202
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=02/07/2017&RollCallId=45
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=82
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/20/2017&RollCallId=97
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/30/2017&RollCallId=378
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=07/08/2017&RollCallId=405

Bill Comments 750

feedback