PA HB2354 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-11-19 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for payments by the Commonwealth; and establishing Do-Not-Pay Initiative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for payments by the Commonwealth; and establishing Do-Not-Pay Initiative.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2354 PN 4014, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 2354 PN 3510, 2019 A6323, GROVE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 2354 PN 3510, 2019 A6144, GROVE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-19SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2020-09-09SenateFirst consideration
2020-09-09SenateReported as committed
2020-06-30SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2020-06-24SenateIn the Senate
2020-06-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2020-06-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-06-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-23HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-06-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-06-09HouseRe-committed to RULES
2020-06-09HouseFirst consideration
2020-06-09HouseReported as committed
2020-04-03HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2354
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2354&pn=3510
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2354&pn=4014
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/09/2020&RollCallId=2177
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1436
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1437
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/23/2020&RollCallId=2272
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1454
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/24/2020&RollCallId=2310
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=09/09/2020&RollCallId=1115

Bill Comments

feedback