PA HB2353 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the assessment and reduction of improper payments by Commonwealth agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the assessment and reduction of improper payments by Commonwealth agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 2353 PN 4013, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 2353 PN 3509, 2019 A6331, BOYLE (Y: 93 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 2353 PN 3509, 2019 A6293, GAYDOS (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2020-06-24SenateIn the Senate
2020-06-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2020-06-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-06-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-23HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-06-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-06-09HouseRe-committed to RULES
2020-06-09HouseFirst consideration
2020-06-09HouseReported as committed
2020-04-03HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2353
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2353&pn=3509
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2353&pn=4013
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/09/2020&RollCallId=2176
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1434
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1435
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/23/2020&RollCallId=2271
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1453
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/24/2020&RollCallId=2309

Bill Comments

feedback