PA HB2352 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Re-reported as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for liability for false claims, for adoption of congressional intent of the Federal False Claims Act, for damages, costs and civil penalties, for powers of Attorney General, for civil investigative demands and for COVID-19-related liability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for liability for false claims, for adoption of congressional intent of the Federal False Claims Act, for damages, costs and civil penalties, for powers of Attorney General, for civil investigative demands and for COVID-19-related liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-30 - House - House State Government: To Table A07424 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-30 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House State Government: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-30 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A07424 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2352 PN 3913, MOT OBJECT REPORT, DERMODY (Y: 109 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A06112 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A06011 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30HouseRe-reported as amended
2020-09-29HouseRe-referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2020-09-29HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-11HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-06-09HouseRe-committed to RULES
2020-06-09HouseFirst consideration
2020-06-09HouseReported as amended
2020-05-21HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2352
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2352&pn=3811
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2352&pn=3913
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2352&pn=4461
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=06/09/2020&RollCallId=2183
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=06/09/2020&RollCallId=2184
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=06/09/2020&RollCallId=2185
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1645
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/30/2020&RollCallId=2552
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/30/2020&RollCallId=2553
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/30/2020&RollCallId=2554
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/30/2020&RollCallId=2551

Bill Comments

feedback