PA HB234 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-20 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-20 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sentencing, further providing for collection of restitution, reparation, fees, costs, fines and penalties.
Title
In sentencing, further providing for collection of restitution, reparation, fees, costs, fines and penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 234 PN 200, FP (Y: 192 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 234 PN 200, FP (Y: 192 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-20 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-03-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-4) |
2017-03-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-03-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-03-13 | House | Second consideration |
2017-02-08 | House | Removed from table |
2017-02-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-02-07 | House | First consideration |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |