PA HB2338 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-6)
Status: Passed on November 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-23 - Act No. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-6)
Status: Passed on November 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-23 - Act No. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act providing for requirements for children in foster care and for grievance policy and procedure.
Title
Providing for requirements for children in foster care and for grievance policy and procedure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-10-12 - Senate - HB 2338 PN 3593, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - House - HB 2338 PN 3593, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - House - HB 2338 PN 3593, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-23 | Act No. 119 | |
2010-11-23 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-11-17 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-11-17 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-10-18 | Signed in House | |
2010-10-12 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-28 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-09-27 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-27 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-22 | First consideration | |
2010-09-22 | Reported as committed | |
2010-06-01 | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH | |
2010-05-04 | In the Senate | |
2010-05-04 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-05-03 | Second consideration | |
2010-05-03 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-04-26 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-04-26 | Removed from table | |
2010-04-21 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-21 | First consideration | |
2010-04-21 | Reported as amended | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |