PA HB2325 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in depositions and witnesses, providing for procedures to protect victims and witnesses with intellectual disabilities or autism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In depositions and witnesses, providing for procedures to protect victims and witnesses with intellectual disabilities or autism.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 2325 PN 3497, FP (Y: 195 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-06-12SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-1)
2018-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-11HouseSecond consideration
2018-06-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-05HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-05HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-05HouseReported as committed
2018-05-03HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2325
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2325&pn=3497
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/05/2018&RollCallId=1585
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/11/2018&RollCallId=1615
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1300
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/12/2018&RollCallId=1657

Bill Comments

feedback