PA HB232 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Act No. 11 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Act No. 11 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school districts, further providing for how constituted.
Title
In school districts, further providing for how constituted.
Sponsors
Rep. Marci Mustello [R] | Rep. James Struzzi [R] | Rep. David Rowe [R] | Rep. Nick Pisciottano [D] |
Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D] | Rep. Abby Major [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 232 PN 2715, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Floor: HB 232 PN 2715, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt Amendment A03651 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Floor: HB 232 PN 2601, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Floor: HB 232 PN 844, 2021 A3363 (Y: 199 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00368 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 232 PN 2715, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Floor: HB 232 PN 2715, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt Amendment A03651 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Floor: HB 232 PN 2601, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Floor: HB 232 PN 844, 2021 A3363 (Y: 199 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00368 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Act No. 11 of 2022 |
2022-02-17 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-02-09 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-02-09 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Signed in House |
2022-02-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (199-0) |
2022-02-09 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-02-09 | House | In the House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2022-01-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-01-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-01-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-01-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-12 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-11-15 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-20 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-25 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-16 | House | Removed from table |
2021-03-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-11 | House | First consideration |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-01-25 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |