PA HB23 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Act No. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Act No. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 29, 2012 (P.L.549, No.54), known as the Primary Stroke Center Recognition Act, further providing for short title, for definitions, for recognition of centers, for emergency medical services and for biennial report.
Title
Further providing for short title, for definitions, for recognition of centers, for emergency medical services and for biennial report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 23 PN 151, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 23 PN 151, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 23 PN 151, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Senate | Act No. 4 |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2017-02-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-02-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2017-02-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-02-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-02-06 | House | Second consideration |
2017-01-25 | House | Removed from table |
2017-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-01-25 | House | First consideration |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to HEALTH |