PA HB2291 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-9)
Status: Engrossed on October 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-15 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in departmental powers and duties as to licensing, further providing for definitions and for right to enter and inspect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In departmental powers and duties as to licensing, further providing for definitions and for right to enter and inspect.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Floor: HB 2291 PN 3917, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A07764 (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-15SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH
2018-10-09SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2018-10-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-10-01HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-01HouseSecond consideration
2018-09-25HouseRemoved from table
2018-09-12HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-09-04HouseCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3917
2018-06-22HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-22HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-22HouseReported as amended
2018-04-23HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2291
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2291&pn=3419
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2291&pn=3812
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2291&pn=3917
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1871
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1872
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1506
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/09/2018&RollCallId=2027

Bill Comments

feedback