PA HB2287 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-21 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-21 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 23 (Domestic Relations) and 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, enacting the Uniform Deployed Parents Custody and Visitation Act; making related repeals; and making editorial changes.
Title
Enacting the Uniform Deployed Parents Custody and Visitation Act; making related repeals; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05635 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2287 PN 3514, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2287 PN 3514, MOTION PROCEED WITH BILL (Y: 198 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2287 PN 3514, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2287 PN 3514, MOTION PROCEED WITH BILL (Y: 198 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2022-09-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-09-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2022-09-21 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2022-09-21 | House | Amended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-20 | House | Second consideration |
2022-09-19 | House | Removed from table |
2022-09-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-09-13 | House | First consideration |
2022-09-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |