PA HB2277 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for time for filing returns.
Title
In sales and use tax, further providing for time for filing returns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt Amendment A05581 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2277 PN 2645, FP (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2277 PN 2645, FP (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2022-04-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2022-04-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-25 | House | Second consideration |
2022-04-13 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-12 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to FINANCE |