PA HB227 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in nomination of candidates, further providing for number of signers required for nomination petitions of candidates at primaries; in ballots, further providing for form of ballots, printing
Title
In nomination of candidates, further providing for number of signers required for nomination petitions of candidates at primaries; in ballots, further providing for form of ballots, printing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 227 PN 2925, CONCUR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 227 PN 2925, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 227 PN 197, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 227 PN 2925, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 227 PN 197, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-27 | House | Act No. 94 |
2019-11-27 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-11-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-11-21 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-11-21 | House | Signed in House |
2019-11-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (187-0) |
2019-11-21 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-11-21 | House | Referred to RULES |
2019-11-20 | House | In the House |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-05-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-02-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-02-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2019-02-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-02-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-02-04 | House | Second consideration |
2019-01-30 | House | Removed from table |
2019-01-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-01-30 | House | First consideration |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |