PA HB2265 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 31, 1968 (P.L.805, No.247), known as the Pennsylvania Municipalities Planning Code, in subdivision and land development, providing for nonbuilding lots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In subdivision and land development, providing for nonbuilding lots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A07814 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A07802 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-20HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-20HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-20HouseReported as amended
2018-04-18HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2265
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2265&pn=3383
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2265&pn=3764
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=06/20/2018&RollCallId=1766
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=06/20/2018&RollCallId=1767
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=06/20/2018&RollCallId=1774

Bill Comments

feedback