PA HB2256 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-10)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 15279, on that portion of State Route 2025, also known as Morton Avenue, over Stony Creek in Morton Borough, Delaware County, as the Captain Michael Malinowski, Sr., Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 15279, on that portion of State Route 2025, also known as Morton Avenue, over Stony Creek in Morton Borough, Delaware County, as the Captain Michael Malinowski, Sr., Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-06 | House | Second consideration |
2020-02-05 | House | Removed from table |
2020-02-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-03 | House | First consideration |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |