PA HB2256 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-13)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 36 over Three Springs Run, South Woodbury Township, Bedford County, as the Marine Lance Corporal Darrell Magruder Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 36 over Three Springs Run, South Woodbury Township, Bedford County, as the Marine Lance Corporal Darrell Magruder Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2256 PN 3321, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2018-05-22SenateIn the Senate
2018-05-22HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2018-05-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-05-02HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-05-02HouseSecond consideration
2018-05-01HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-30HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-30HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-30HouseReported as committed
2018-04-11HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback