PA HB2254 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 11 (Cities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for city classification; making a related repeal; and making editorial changes.
Title
Providing for city classification; making a related repeal; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Jerome Knowles [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] |
Rep. Christina Sappey [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2254 PN 2610, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2254 PN 2610, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-08 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-25 | House | First consideration |
2022-05-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |