PA HB2247 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-13)
Status: Engrossed on September 1 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 25488, carrying State Route 1011 over the Mix Creek, Eldred Township, McKean County, as the Sgt. Neil K. Dorrion Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 25488, carrying State Route 1011 over the Mix Creek, Eldred Township, McKean County, as the Sgt. Neil K. Dorrion Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2247 PN 3922, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05856 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-18SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2020-09-01SenateIn the Senate
2020-09-01HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2020-09-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-07-14HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-07-14HouseSecond consideration
2020-07-14HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-06-10HouseRe-committed to RULES
2020-06-10HouseFirst consideration
2020-06-10HouseReported as amended
2020-01-30HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2247
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2247&pn=3229
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2247&pn=3922
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/10/2020&RollCallId=2216
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/10/2020&RollCallId=2217
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=07/14/2020&RollCallId=2361
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1541
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/01/2020&RollCallId=2428

Bill Comments

feedback