PA HB224 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-14)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Act No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-14)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Act No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school health services, providing for administration of epinephrine auto-injectors by school bus drivers and school crossing guards.
Title
In school health services, providing for administration of epinephrine auto-injectors by school bus drivers and school crossing guards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 224 PN 426, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 224 PN 426, FP (Y: 186 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Floor: HB 224 PN 193, 2017 A180, STURLA (Y: 197 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 224 PN 426, FP (Y: 186 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Floor: HB 224 PN 193, 2017 A180, STURLA (Y: 197 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Act No. 2 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-03-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2017-03-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-03-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (186-1) |
2017-03-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-02-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-02-08 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-02-07 | House | Removed from table |
2017-02-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-02-06 | House | First consideration |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |