PA HB2238 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 21, 1949 (P.L.665, No.155), known as the First Class City Home Rule Act, in general grant of powers and limitations, providing for term of office and limit for district attorney.
Title
In general grant of powers and limitations, providing for term of office and limit for district attorney.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2238 PN 2590, FP (Y: 115 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 2238 PN 2590, 2021 A4024 (Y: 60 N: 140 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 2238 PN 2590, 2021 A3922 (Y: 65 N: 135 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-12 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2238 PN 2590, FP (Y: 115 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 2238 PN 2590, 2021 A4024 (Y: 60 N: 140 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 2238 PN 2590, 2021 A3922 (Y: 65 N: 135 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-12 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2022-04-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (115-88) |
2022-04-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-25 | House | Second consideration |
2022-04-13 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-12 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |