PA HB223 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Act No. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Act No. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission and the Governor, to grant and convey to French Azilum, Inc., certain lands situate in Asylum Township, Bradford County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission and the Governor, to grant and convey to French Azilum, Inc., certain lands situate in Asylum Township, Bradford County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 223 PN 1975, CONCUR (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 223 PN 1975, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 223 PN 193, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 223 PN 1975, CONCUR (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 223 PN 1975, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 223 PN 193, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Act No. 10 |
2019-06-21 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-11 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-10 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-10 | House | Signed in House |
2019-06-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (196-0) |
2019-06-10 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-05 | House | Referred to RULES |
2019-06-04 | House | In the House |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-05-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-04-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2019-04-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-08 | House | Second consideration |
2019-03-27 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-27 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |