PA HB223 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 14, 1982 (P.L.1227, No.281), known as the Architects Licensure Law, further providing for definitions, for powers of board and for issuance and renewal of certificates.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for powers of board and for issuance and renewal of certificates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 223 PN 192, FP (Y: 189 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 223 PN 192, FP (Y: 189 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2017-04-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-8) |
2017-04-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-03 | House | Second consideration |
2017-03-22 | House | Removed from table |
2017-03-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-03-21 | House | First consideration |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |