PA HB2227 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-11)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for persons not to possess, use, manufacture, control, sell or transfer firearms; in community and municipal courts, further providing for masters; and adding provisions relating to extreme risk protection orders.
Title
In firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for persons not to possess, use, manufacture, control, sell or transfer firearms; in community and municipal courts, further providing for masters; and adding provisions relating to extreme risk protection orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A07721 (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A07721 (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2018-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-09-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-19 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-04-16 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |