PA HB2219 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on July 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 31, 1945 (P.L.1198, No.418), known as the Surface Mining Conservation and Reclamation Act, further providing for Mining and Reclamation Advisory Board.
Title
Further providing for Mining and Reclamation Advisory Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2219 PN 3950, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A06273 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2219 PN 3950, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A06273 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-10 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2020-07-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-07-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-07-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-07-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-07-08 | House | Second consideration |
2020-07-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2020-06-23 | House | First consideration |
2020-06-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |