PA HB2215 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, further providing for fire and emergency evacuation drills.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In terms and courses of study, further providing for fire and emergency evacuation drills.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 2215 PN 3594, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A07258 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2018-06-18SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2018-06-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-13HouseSecond consideration
2018-06-05HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-04HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-04HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-04HouseReported as amended
2018-04-02HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2215
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2215&pn=3232
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2215&pn=3594
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=06/04/2018&RollCallId=1569
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=06/04/2018&RollCallId=1570
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1323
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/18/2018&RollCallId=1703

Bill Comments

feedback