PA HB2212 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the act of September 1, 1965 (P.L.420, No.215), entitled "An act for the protection of the public health, and to prevent fraud and deception in the manufacture, sale, offering for sale, exposing for sale, and possession with intent to sell, of adulterated or deleterious frozen desserts, providing for licensing, authorizing and regulating the manufacture and sale of frozen desserts, conferring powers and imposing duties upon the Department of Agriculture, prescribing penalties, providing for the enforcement thereof, and making repeals."
Title
Repealing the act of September 1, 1965 (P.L.420, No.215), entitled "An act for the protection of the public health, and to prevent fraud and deception in the manufacture, sale, offering for sale, exposing for sale, and possession with intent to sell, of adulterated or deleterious frozen desserts, providing for licensing, authorizing and regulating the manufacture and sale of frozen desserts, conferring powers and imposing duties upon the Department of Agriculture, prescribing penalties, providing for the enforcement thereof, and making repeals."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 2212 PN 2577, FP (Y: 198 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 2212 PN 2577, FP (Y: 198 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2022-04-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-1) |
2022-04-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-03-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-03-29 | House | Second consideration |
2022-02-09 | House | Removed from table |
2022-02-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-08 | House | First consideration |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |