PA HB2212 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-15)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-22 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-22 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, providing for financial disclosures for pharmacy services.
Title
In public assistance, providing for financial disclosures for pharmacy services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2212 PN 3762, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2212 PN 3762, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, HEFFLEY (Y: 185 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2212 PN 3666, 2017 A7748, KINSEY (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2212 PN 3666, 2017 A7727, HEFFLEY (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A07460 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2212 PN 3762, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, HEFFLEY (Y: 185 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2212 PN 3666, 2017 A7748, KINSEY (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2212 PN 3666, 2017 A7727, HEFFLEY (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A07460 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2018-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2018-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-19 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-12 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-12 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2018-06-07 | House | Referred to HEALTH |