PA HB221 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in selection and retention of judicial officers, further providing for continuing education requirement; and, in municipal police education and training, further providing for powers and duties of Municipal Police Officers' Education and Training Commission.
Title
In selection and retention of judicial officers, further providing for continuing education requirement; and, in municipal police education and training, further providing for powers and duties of Municipal Police Officers' Education and Training Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 221 PN 464, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 221 PN 464, FP (Y: 197 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Floor: HB 221 PN 309, 2015 A95, ELLIS (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00015 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00015 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Floor: HB 221 PN 464, FP (Y: 197 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Floor: HB 221 PN 309, 2015 A95, ELLIS (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00015 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00015 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Act No. 25 |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Signed in House |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-03-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-02-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-02-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-1) |
2015-02-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-02-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-02-09 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-02-04 | House | Removed from table |
2015-02-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-02-03 | House | First consideration |
2015-02-03 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |