PA HB2204 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in vocational education, providing for a workforce development program clearinghouse.
Title
In vocational education, providing for a workforce development program clearinghouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2204 PN 3252, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2204 PN 3252, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2018-04-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2018-04-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-18 | House | Second consideration |
2018-04-17 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-16 | House | First consideration |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-04-04 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |