PA HB2204 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-08 - Referred to FINANCE
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-08 - Referred to FINANCE
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 10, 1981 (P.L.214, No.67), known as the Bingo Law, further providing for definitions and for rules for licensing and operation; providing for progressive jackpots; and further providing for revocation of licenses.
Title
An Act amending the act of July 10, 1981 (P.L.214, No.67), known as the Bingo Law, further providing for definitions and for rules for licensing and operation; providing for progressive jackpots; and further providing for revocation of licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-05-08 | Referred to FINANCE | |
2008-05-07 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-05-05 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2008-05-05 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-03-11 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-03-11 | Removed from table | |
2008-03-10 | Laid on the table | |
2008-03-10 | First consideration | |
2008-03-10 | Reported as amended | |
2008-01-28 | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2204 |