PA HB2203 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in vocational education, providing for an online career resource center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In vocational education, providing for an online career resource center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 2203 PN 3286, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2018-04-30SenateIn the Senate
2018-04-30HouseThird consideration and final passage (192-0)
2018-04-30HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-18HouseSecond consideration
2018-04-17HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-16HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-16HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-16HouseReported as committed
2018-04-09HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback