PA HB2200 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of the Department of Justice and its departmental administrative boards, further providing for Bureau of Consumer Protection and providing for opioid action task force; in powers and duties of the Department of Health and its departmental administrative and advisory boards, further providing for residential drug and alcohol treatment programs for pregnant women and mothers and their dependent children and for staff training and referral mechanisms; in powers and duties of the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs, providing for residential drug and alcohol treatment programs for pregnant women and mothers and their dependent children; providing for intergovernmental collaboration on substance abuse and for public health emergency; and making editorial changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In powers and duties of the Department of Justice and its departmental administrative boards, further providing for Bureau of Consumer Protection and providing for opioid action task force; in powers and duties of the Department of Health and its departmental administrative and advisory boards, further providing for residential drug and alcohol treatment programs for pregnant women and mothers and their dependent children and for staff training and referral mechanisms; in powers and duties of the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs, providing for residential drug and alcohol treatment programs for pregnant women and mothers and their dependent children; providing for intergovernmental collaboration on substance abuse and for public health emergency; and making editorial changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A07333 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-12HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-12HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-12HouseReported as amended
2018-04-02HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback