PA HB22 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act No. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act No. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 13 (Commercial Code) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in transfers of funds, further providing for exclusion of consumer transactions governed by Federal law; and making an editorial change.
Title
In transfers of funds, further providing for exclusion of consumer transactions governed by Federal law; and making an editorial change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-29 - Senate - HB 22 PN 115, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - HB 22 PN 115, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - HB 22 PN 115, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | Act No. 49 |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-03-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-03-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2013-03-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-03-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-03-18 | House | Second consideration |
2013-03-13 | House | Removed from table |
2013-03-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-03-12 | House | First consideration |
2013-03-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-01-16 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |