PA HB2195 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Engrossed on July 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 57053, located over Dixon Run at the intersection of State Route 1012 to Pennsylvania Route 403 in Green Township, Indiana County, as the PVT William L. Hadden Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 57053, located over Dixon Run at the intersection of State Route 1012 to Pennsylvania Route 403 in Green Township, Indiana County, as the PVT William L. Hadden Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2195 PN 3103, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2195 PN 3103, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-10 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-07-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-07-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-07-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-07 | House | Second consideration |
2020-02-05 | House | Removed from table |
2020-02-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-03 | House | First consideration |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-01-10 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |